THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: Shelley, Tennille Dawn (Used Until: 25 Jul 2007)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton District Hospital
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 661 Martin Street
Ministry of Community Safety and Correctional Services
Milton Ontario L9T 2Y3
Phone: (905) 878-8141
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6 Albert St
West Parry Sound Health Centre
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tennille Dawn Shelley Paulsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Paulsen (CPSO#: 83031 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

General Information

Former Name: Shelley, Tennille Dawn (Used Until: 25 Jul 2007)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton District Hospital
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 661 Martin Street
Ministry of Community Safety and Correctional Services
Milton Ontario L9T 2Y3
Phone: (905) 878-8141
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6 Albert St
West Parry Sound Health Centre
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tennille Dawn Shelley Paulsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Paulsen (CPSO#: 83031 )
Business Address: 725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2383

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TENNILLE DAWN SHELLEY PAULSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAULSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TENNILLE DAWN SHELLEY PAULSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAULSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005