THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 18:00:17 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206-A
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 878-5200
Fax: (705) 878-5229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriel W.L. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan (CPSO#: 83032 )
Business Address: Suite 206-2
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5G6
(705) 878-5200
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 206A-189 Kent St W
Unit 206A
Lindsay ON K9V 5G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206-A
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 878-5200
Fax: (705) 878-5229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriel W.L. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan (CPSO#: 83032 )
Business Address: Suite 206-2
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5G6
(705) 878-5200
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5B7
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 206A-189 Kent St W
Unit 206A
Lindsay ON K9V 5G6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL WAI LANG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL WAI LANG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005