THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:29:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
6-001 Donnelly wing, 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5561
Fax: (416) 864-5854
Address: Womens College Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6269
Fax: 416-323-2666
Address: Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
Dept. of Anesthesia and Pain Mgmt.
200 Elizabeth Street 3EN-464
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 5164
Fax: 416 340 3698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John G. Hanlon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hanlon (CPSO#: 83033 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
6-001 Donnelly wing, 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5561
Fax: (416) 864-5854
Address: Womens College Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-6269
Fax: 416-323-2666
Address: Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
Dept. of Anesthesia and Pain Mgmt.
200 Elizabeth Street 3EN-464
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 5164
Fax: 416 340 3698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John G. Hanlon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hanlon (CPSO#: 83033 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE HANLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE HANLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005