THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:39:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Danforth Family Care Centre
2885 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 690-9000
Fax: (416) 690-9005
Address: Unit # 3
1375 Danforth Rd, Scarborough.
Toronto Ontario M1J 1G7
Phone: 416 261 0848
Fax: 416 690 9005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubina Roqueyya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Roqueyya (CPSO#: 83038 )
Business Address: 1375 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1J 1G7
(416) 261-0848
Business Address: 2885 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1M3
(416) 690-9000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Danforth Family Care Centre
2885 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 690-9000
Fax: (416) 690-9005
Address: Unit # 3
1375 Danforth Rd, Scarborough.
Toronto Ontario M1J 1G7
Phone: 416 261 0848
Fax: 416 690 9005

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rubina Roqueyya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Roqueyya (CPSO#: 83038 )
Business Address: 1375 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M1J 1G7
(416) 261-0848
Business Address: 2885 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 1M3
(416) 690-9000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBINA ROQUEYYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROQUEYYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUBINA ROQUEYYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROQUEYYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005