THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:10:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosy Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zafar (CPSO#: 83040 )
Business Address: Suite 700
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-9900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosy Zafar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zafar (CPSO#: 83040 )
Business Address: Suite 700
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-9900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSY ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROSY ZAFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005