THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:32:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Level 2
Crown Point Family Health Centre
Hamilton Family Health Team
Hamilton Ontario L8H 4R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 547-2302
Fax: (905) 548-9722
Address: Shelter Health Network
Good Shepherd Health Clinic
850 King St E
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1B4
Phone: (905) 526-7137
Fax: (905) 526-7969
Address: Shelter Health Network
CMHA Primary Care Clinic
131 John Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2C3
Phone: (905) 521-0090
Extension: 256
Fax: (905) 667-5029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haider Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 83046 )
Business Address: 131 John Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2C3
(905) 521-0090 Extn: 256
Business Address: 67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8H 4R6
(905) 547-2302
Business Address: 850 King Street East
Shelter Health Network
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1B4
905-526-7137 Extn: 905-526-7969

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Level 2
Crown Point Family Health Centre
Hamilton Family Health Team
Hamilton Ontario L8H 4R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 547-2302
Fax: (905) 548-9722
Address: Shelter Health Network
Good Shepherd Health Clinic
850 King St E
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1B4
Phone: (905) 526-7137
Fax: (905) 526-7969
Address: Shelter Health Network
CMHA Primary Care Clinic
131 John Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2C3
Phone: (905) 521-0090
Extension: 256
Fax: (905) 667-5029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haider Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Saeed (CPSO#: 83046 )
Business Address: 131 John Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8N 2C3
(905) 521-0090 Extn: 256
Business Address: 67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8H 4R6
(905) 547-2302
Business Address: 850 King Street East
Shelter Health Network
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1B4
905-526-7137 Extn: 905-526-7969

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAIDER ALI SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAIDER ALI SAEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005