THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:35:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Gillingham Drive
Suite 200
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elen Kostopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kostopoulos (CPSO#: 83077 )
Business Address: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Gillingham Drive
Suite 200
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elen Kostopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kostopoulos (CPSO#: 83077 )
Business Address: Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEN KOSTOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSTOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEN KOSTOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSTOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005