THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:17:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-933-2855
Fax: 647-933-2855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.U. Wolf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wolf (CPSO#: 83084 )
Business Address: 3910 Bathurst St
Suite 403
North York ON M3H 5Z3
6479332855
Business Address: Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Brain Health Complex Room 4W02
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2000 Extn: 2521
Business Address: Suite 302
2788 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6B 3A3
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 2521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-3910 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 5Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-933-2855
Fax: 647-933-2855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.U. Wolf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wolf (CPSO#: 83084 )
Business Address: 3910 Bathurst St
Suite 403
North York ON M3H 5Z3
6479332855
Business Address: Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Brain Health Complex Room 4W02
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2000 Extn: 2521
Business Address: Suite 302
2788 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6B 3A3
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 2521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL URI WOLF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL URI WOLF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005