THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:09:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 19
1235 Queensway East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-804-1919
Fax: 905-997-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Carmona Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Carmona (CPSO#: 83101 )
Business Address: 19-1235 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 0G4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 19
1235 Queensway East
Mississauga Ontario L4Y0G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-804-1919
Fax: 905-997-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 15 Oct 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Carmona Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Carmona (CPSO#: 83101 )
Business Address: 19-1235 Queensway E
Mississauga ON L4Y 0G4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJENDRA JUNIOR CARMONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARMONA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJENDRA JUNIOR CARMONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARMONA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005