THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:57:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056851381
Fax: 9056889905

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Dooler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dooler (CPSO#: 83117 )
Business Address: 541 Glenridge Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
9058922777
Business Address: 555 Prince Charles Drive
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 735-1701

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 541 Glenridge Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056851381
Fax: 9056889905

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Dooler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dooler (CPSO#: 83117 )
Business Address: 541 Glenridge Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
9058922777
Business Address: 555 Prince Charles Drive
Welland Ontario L3C 6B5
(905) 735-1701

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN DOOLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN DOOLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005