THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 St. Paul Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137713400
Fax: (613) 771-1016
Address: 100 St. Paul Street
Belleville Ontario K8N1B2
Phone: 6137713400
Fax: 6137711016
Address: Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8P 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Gartshore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gartshore (CPSO#: 83121 )
Business Address: 100 St Paul St
Belleville ON K8N 1B2

Corporation Name: Webster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 St. Paul Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137713400
Fax: (613) 771-1016
Address: 100 St. Paul Street
Belleville Ontario K8N1B2
Phone: 6137713400
Fax: 6137711016
Address: Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8P 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Gartshore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gartshore (CPSO#: 83121 )
Business Address: 100 St Paul St
Belleville ON K8N 1B2

Corporation Name: Webster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER DAWN GARTSHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARTSHORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER DAWN GARTSHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARTSHORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005