THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:27:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Dept. Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Ave
(416) 242 1000
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Apr 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davoudpour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Davoudpour (CPSO#: 83127 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 530-6004
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
Dept. Emergency Medicine
1235 Wilson Ave
(416) 242 1000
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Apr 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jan 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davoudpour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Davoudpour (CPSO#: 83127 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 530-6004
Business Address: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARHAM DAVOUDPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVOUDPOUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARHAM DAVOUDPOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVOUDPOUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005