THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, KASHMIRI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10A
30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 712-2288
Fax: (905) 712-8228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahjabeen Ammad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ammad (CPSO#: 83136 )
Business Address: 10A - 30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3E7
(905) 712-2288

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, KASHMIRI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10A
30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 712-2288
Fax: (905) 712-8228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahjabeen Ammad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ammad (CPSO#: 83136 )
Business Address: 10A - 30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5R 3E7
(905) 712-2288

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHJABEEN AMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHJABEEN AMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005