THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:03:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: 6138837695
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lukasz Bartosik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bartosik (CPSO#: 83144 )
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 719-4994

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, POLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Phone: 6138837695
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lukasz Bartosik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Apr 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bartosik (CPSO#: 83144 )
Business Address: Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 719-4994

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKASZ PIOTR BARTOSIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTOSIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUKASZ PIOTR BARTOSIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTOSIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005