THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:32:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 314 Broadway
Orangeville ON L9W 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-942-3101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Felix Kreichman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kreichman (CPSO#: 83153 )
Business Address: 102-2315 Bristol Cir
Oakville ON L6H 6P8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 314 Broadway
Orangeville ON L9W 1L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-519-942-3101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Felix Kreichman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kreichman (CPSO#: 83153 )
Business Address: 102-2315 Bristol Cir
Oakville ON L6H 6P8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FELIX KREICHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREICHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FELIX KREICHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREICHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005