THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B12-300 North Service Rd W
Wellmedica Dermatology Centre
Oakville
Units B12-B13
Oakville ON L6M 2R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-338-3730
Fax: 905-338-3731
Address: 115 Midair Crt
Brampton ON L6T 5M3
Phone: 18005655721
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
Phone: 5198368558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Dermatology
5th Floor, Dermatology
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yvette Miller-Monthrope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Miller-Monthrope (CPSO#: 83155 )
Business Address: 206/7-1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(905) 625-5600
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B12-300 North Service Rd W
Wellmedica Dermatology Centre
Oakville
Units B12-B13
Oakville ON L6M 2R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-338-3730
Fax: 905-338-3731
Address: 115 Midair Crt
Brampton ON L6T 5M3
Phone: 18005655721
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-33 Farley Dr
Guelph ON N1L 0B7
Phone: 5198368558
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Department of Medicine, Division of Dermatology
5th Floor, Dermatology
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yvette Miller-Monthrope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Miller-Monthrope (CPSO#: 83155 )
Business Address: 206/7-1065 Canadian Place
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2
(905) 625-5600
Business Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-7546

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YVETTE ELOUISE MILLER-MONTHROPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER-MONTHROPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YVETTE ELOUISE MILLER-MONTHROPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER-MONTHROPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005