THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:51:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: (705) 673-7330
Address: 65 Larch Street, Suite 401
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 673-8391
Fax: (705) 673-7330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bhatia (CPSO#: 83157 )
Business Address: 401-65 Larch St
Sudbury ON P3E 1B8
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: (705) 673-7330
Address: 65 Larch Street, Suite 401
Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8
Phone: (705) 673-8391
Fax: (705) 673-7330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bhatia (CPSO#: 83157 )
Business Address: 401-65 Larch St
Sudbury ON P3E 1B8
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Bhatia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PANKAJ BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PANKAJ BHATIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHATIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005