THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:04:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 720 King St W
Toronto ON M5V 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4000 Weston Rd
North York ON M9L 3A2
Phone: (416) 747-8484
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majella Emmanuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Emmanuel (CPSO#: 83162 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 430-4800
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 720 King St W
Toronto ON M5V 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4000 Weston Rd
North York ON M9L 3A2
Phone: (416) 747-8484
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majella Emmanuel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Emmanuel (CPSO#: 83162 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 430-4800
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJELLA PRIYANTHI EMMANUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMMANUEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAJELLA PRIYANTHI EMMANUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMMANUEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005