THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi (CPSO#: 83174 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI, RUSSIAN
Medical School: The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mohammadzadeh Yaghchi (CPSO#: 83174 )
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHROOZ HAMID MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHROOZ HAMID MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMADZADEH YAGHCHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005