THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:00:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National Medical University, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 341 Trunk Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 6970
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 5254
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 6970
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diyana Docheva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Docheva (CPSO#: 83176 )
Business Address: 98 Lewis Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 4G4
9025292102
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(902) 529-2101
Business Address: 341 Trunk Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 3S9
7057593434 Extn: 6970

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: National Medical University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 341 Trunk Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 3S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 6970
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Extension: 5254
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-759-3434
Extension: 6970
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diyana Docheva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Docheva (CPSO#: 83176 )
Business Address: 98 Lewis Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 4G4
9025292102
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(902) 529-2101
Business Address: 341 Trunk Rd
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 3S9
7057593434 Extn: 6970

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIYANA STANEVA DOCHEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCHEVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIYANA STANEVA DOCHEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCHEVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National Medical University, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005