THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Bank Medical clinic
2430 Bank Street
Unit 1
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 736 6946
Extension: Ext 6
Fax: 613 736 6948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harini Silva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Silva (CPSO#: 83197 )
Business Address: 1-2430 Bank St
South Bank Medical Clinic
Ottawa ON K1V 0T7
613 736 6946 Extn: Ext 6
Business Address: 1-2430 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 0T7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: South Bank Medical clinic
2430 Bank Street
Unit 1
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 736 6946
Extension: Ext 6
Fax: 613 736 6948

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harini Silva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Silva (CPSO#: 83197 )
Business Address: 1-2430 Bank St
South Bank Medical Clinic
Ottawa ON K1V 0T7
613 736 6946 Extn: Ext 6
Business Address: 1-2430 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1V 0T7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARINI GEETHANEE SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARINI GEETHANEE SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peradeniya, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005