THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:36:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tianjin Medical University, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pan (CPSO#: 83217 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Tianjin Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pan (CPSO#: 83217 )
Business Address: Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor Ontario N8W 2X3
(519) 253-5253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MING PAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MING PAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tianjin Medical University, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005