THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:01:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117 Centrepointe Drive Unit #205
Ottawa ON K2G 5X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 695-5334
Fax: (613) 695-5336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew DeAngelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeAngelis (CPSO#: 83222 )
Business Address: 205 - 117 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X3
(613) 695-5334

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117 Centrepointe Drive Unit #205
Ottawa ON K2G 5X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 695-5334
Fax: (613) 695-5336

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew DeAngelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. DeAngelis (CPSO#: 83222 )
Business Address: 205 - 117 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 5X3
(613) 695-5334

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANTHONY DEANGELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANGELIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW ANTHONY DEANGELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEANGELIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005