THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas Street West
Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre
Oakville Ontario L6M 4M2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-257-5779
Fax: 1-855-300-4761
Address: UNIT A4
9131 KEELE STREET
Vaughan Ontario L4K0G7
Phone: 289-514-0800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 438
1720 Howard ave
Windsor Ontario N8X5A6
Phone: 519-903-6015
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmed M. Jwely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jwely (CPSO#: 83239 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
905 848 7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas Street West
Dundas Neyagawa Medical Centre
Oakville Ontario L6M 4M2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-257-5779
Fax: 1-855-300-4761
Address: UNIT A4
9131 KEELE STREET
Vaughan Ontario L4K0G7
Phone: 289-514-0800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 438
1720 Howard ave
Windsor Ontario N8X5A6
Phone: 519-903-6015
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 02 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmed M. Jwely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jwely (CPSO#: 83239 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
905 848 7100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Aug 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 16 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ahmed Milad Jwely may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ahmed Milad Jwely may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2005