THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:49:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Endoscopy Centre
13291 Yonge Street Suite 400
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 751-2930
Fax: (866) 643-9669
Address: MSUCC
110 CopperCreek Dr #100
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pharmasante
10815 Bathurst Srt Unit 23-24
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9Y2
Phone: (905) 780-1050
Fax: 905-780-1055
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave, Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.E. Ginzburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ginzburg (CPSO#: 83244 )
Business Address: OREC
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 400
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: MSUCC
100 - 110 Coppercreek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Address: 10815 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9Y2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oak Ridges Endoscopy Centre
13291 Yonge Street Suite 400
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 751-2930
Fax: (866) 643-9669
Address: MSUCC
110 CopperCreek Dr #100
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pharmasante
10815 Bathurst Srt Unit 23-24
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9Y2
Phone: (905) 780-1050
Fax: 905-780-1055
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave, Toronto, ON
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Nursing Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Nursing
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.E. Ginzburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ginzburg (CPSO#: 83244 )
Business Address: OREC
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 400
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Address: MSUCC
100 - 110 Coppercreek Drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Address: 10815 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9Y2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VAL ELIEZER GINZBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBURG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VAL ELIEZER GINZBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINZBURG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005