THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405-4430 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163982220
Fax: 4163982221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.R. Kagal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kagal (CPSO#: 83250 )
Business Address: 407 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
(416) 398-2220
Business Address: 405-4430 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 3S3
4163982220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405-4430 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163982220
Fax: 4163982221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.R. Kagal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kagal (CPSO#: 83250 )
Business Address: 407 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
(416) 398-2220
Business Address: 405-4430 Bathurst St
North York ON M3H 3S3
4163982220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARREN RONEN KAGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARREN RONEN KAGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005