THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tianjin Medical University, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 200
30 Prospect St.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Phone: 9052357284
Fax: 9052357320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meijian Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zhao (CPSO#: 83251 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 200 - 30 Prospect Street
Pediatric and Teen Health Clinic
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Tianjin Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 200
30 Prospect St.
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
Phone: 9052357284
Fax: 9052357320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meijian Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zhao (CPSO#: 83251 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 200 - 30 Prospect Street
Pediatric and Teen Health Clinic
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3S9
(905) 235-7284

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEIJIAN ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEIJIAN ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tianjin Medical University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005