THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:43:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tanta University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 King George RD
Brantford Ontario N3R 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 759-0010
Fax: (519) 759-4310
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yousery Koubaesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Koubaesh (CPSO#: 83266 )
Business Address: 156 Charing Cross Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 2J4
(519) 759-0010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Tanta University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 222 King George RD
Brantford Ontario N3R 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 759-0010
Fax: (519) 759-4310
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yousery Koubaesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Koubaesh (CPSO#: 83266 )
Business Address: 156 Charing Cross Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 2J4
(519) 759-0010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSERY YOUSSEF RIZK KOUBAESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUBAESH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSERY YOUSSEF RIZK KOUBAESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUBAESH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tanta University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005