THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:07:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Erie Shores Health Care
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Extension: 4136
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1750 Division Street North
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 4G7
Phone: (519) 733-9303
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 12
59 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1A1
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Address: Windsor Reagional Hospital
1030 Ouelette Avenua
Windsor
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: 519 9734421
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luther Heys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Heys (CPSO#: 83270 )
Business Address: 10 - 59 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1A1
(519) 322-1100
Business Address: Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4421
Business Address: 1750 Division Street North
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 4G7
(519) 733-9303

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Erie Shores Health Care
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 326-2373
Extension: 4136
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1750 Division Street North
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 4G7
Phone: (519) 733-9303
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 12
59 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1A1
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Address: Windsor Reagional Hospital
1030 Ouelette Avenua
Windsor
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: 519 9734421
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luther Heys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Heys (CPSO#: 83270 )
Business Address: 10 - 59 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 1A1
(519) 322-1100
Business Address: Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4421
Business Address: 1750 Division Street North
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 4G7
(519) 733-9303

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUTHER LINDE HEYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEYS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUTHER LINDE HEYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEYS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Orange Free State, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2005