THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
The Medical Centre
K9J 7B3
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058764535
Fax: 7057437874

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nimigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nimigan (CPSO#: 83276 )
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4536

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 707 Charlotte Street
The Medical Centre
K9J 7B3
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058764535
Fax: 7057437874

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nimigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nimigan (CPSO#: 83276 )
Business Address: The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7B3
(705) 876-4536

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE SYLVAIN NIMIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMIGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE SYLVAIN NIMIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMIGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005