THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:57:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouville Urgent Care Centr
Suite 100
110 copper creek drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: 905-472-6081
Address: Q MEDICAL
1600 Steeles Ave W #312,
Concord Ontario L4K 4M2
Phone: 905-597-0088
Fax: 905 597-5568
Address: Assessmed
Founders Square, Hollis St,
Halifax Nova Scotia B3J 3M8
Phone: 1 855-465-2924
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 6-6061 Young Street
Halifax Nova Scotia B3K 2A3
Phone: (902) 492-4791
Fax: No Information Available
Address: OATC LONGLAC
92 Indian Road
Longlac Ontario P0T 2A0
Phone: (807) 876-9666
Fax: (807) 876-9777
Address: GSH Medical Pain Management Centre
Suite 106
7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253
Address: Ontario Addiction Treatment Centre
45 Bloor Street East, Unit 2
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3L9
Phone: (905) 443-0223
Fax: (905) 443-0225
Address: OATC Vanier
263 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1L 6C4
Phone: (613) 749-9666
Fax: 613-749-4555
Address: OATC OTTAWA WEST
1318 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K8
Phone: (613) 627-0856
Fax: (613) 715-9174
Address: Oatc Ottawa Clinic
401 Somerset St W
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0K1
Phone: (613) 233-1114
Fax: (613) 233-1141
Address: suite 5c-1099 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Phone: 1 866-611-7642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldstein (CPSO#: 83279 )
Business Address: 92 Indian Road
Longlac Ontario P0T 2A0
(807) 876-9666
Business Address: 100 - 110 Copper Creek Boulevard
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911
Business Address: 45 Bloor Street East
Unit 2
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3L9
(905) 443-0223
Business Address: 102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
(905) 305-9484
Business Address: 401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0K1
(613) 627-0856

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouville Urgent Care Centr
Suite 100
110 copper creek drive
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-8911
Fax: 905-472-6081
Address: Q MEDICAL
1600 Steeles Ave W #312,
Concord Ontario L4K 4M2
Phone: 905-597-0088
Fax: 905 597-5568
Address: Assessmed
Founders Square, Hollis St,
Halifax Nova Scotia B3J 3M8
Phone: 1 855-465-2924
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 6-6061 Young Street
Halifax Nova Scotia B3K 2A3
Phone: (902) 492-4791
Fax: No Information Available
Address: OATC LONGLAC
92 Indian Road
Longlac Ontario P0T 2A0
Phone: (807) 876-9666
Fax: (807) 876-9777
Address: GSH Medical Pain Management Centre
Suite 106
7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham Ontario L3R 1A3
Phone: 416-789-2449
Fax: 416-789-2253
Address: Ontario Addiction Treatment Centre
45 Bloor Street East, Unit 2
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3L9
Phone: (905) 443-0223
Fax: (905) 443-0225
Address: OATC Vanier
263 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1L 6C4
Phone: (613) 749-9666
Fax: 613-749-4555
Address: OATC OTTAWA WEST
1318 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K8
Phone: (613) 627-0856
Fax: (613) 715-9174
Address: Oatc Ottawa Clinic
401 Somerset St W
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0K1
Phone: (613) 233-1114
Fax: (613) 233-1141
Address: suite 5c-1099 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1B5
Phone: 1 866-611-7642
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Goldstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldstein (CPSO#: 83279 )
Business Address: 92 Indian Road
Longlac Ontario P0T 2A0
(807) 876-9666
Business Address: 100 - 110 Copper Creek Boulevard
Markham Ontario L6B 0P9
(905) 472-8911
Business Address: 45 Bloor Street East
Unit 2
Oshawa Ontario L1H 3L9
(905) 443-0223
Business Address: 102 - 8920 Woodbine Avenue
Markham Ontario L3R 9W9
(905) 305-9484
Business Address: 401 Somerset Street West
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0K1
(613) 627-0856

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID GOLDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005