THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 06:06:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1290 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-6887
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apostolos Titis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Titis (CPSO#: 83289 )
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-6887

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1290 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-721-6887
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apostolos Titis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Titis (CPSO#: 83289 )
Business Address: 1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 721-6887

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APOSTOLOS TITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TITIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APOSTOLOS TITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TITIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005