THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:03:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, IGBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 155 Main Street East
209
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053091947
Fax: 9053093210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nwachukwu Ifeanyi Nwebube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwebube (CPSO#: 83302 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 309-1947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN, IGBO
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 155 Main Street East
209
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053091947
Fax: 9053093210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nwachukwu Ifeanyi Nwebube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nwebube (CPSO#: 83302 )
Business Address: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
169 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P3
(905) 309-1947

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NWACHUKWU IFEANYI NWEBUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWEBUBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NWACHUKWU IFEANYI NWEBUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWEBUBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2005