THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350 Rutherford Rd
Unit 300, Plaza II
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 240 Alton towers circle, suite 300
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 408-2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9135 Keele street,
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alizadeh-Ebadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alizadeh-Ebadi (CPSO#: 83305 )
Business Address: A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: Unit 300, Plaza 2
350 Rutherford Road
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 663-3937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AZARI, FARSI, TURKISH
Medical School: Tabriz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350 Rutherford Rd
Unit 300, Plaza II
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 240 Alton towers circle, suite 300
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Address: 408-2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 9135 Keele street,
Unit A5
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alizadeh-Ebadi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alizadeh-Ebadi (CPSO#: 83305 )
Business Address: A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: Unit 300, Plaza 2
350 Rutherford Road
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Toronto Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 663-3937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHMOUD ALIZADEH-EBADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIZADEH-EBADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHMOUD ALIZADEH-EBADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIZADEH-EBADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tabriz University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005