THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:54:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mothilal Nehru Medical College,Allahabad, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Department of Laboratory medicine
THP (Credit Valley Hospital)
Mississauga Ontario L5M2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Extension: 2765
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kaur (CPSO#: 83328 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200 Extn: 2765
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners (M-Site)
Department of Pathology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Mothilal Nehru Medical College,Allahabad, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Department of Laboratory medicine
THP (Credit Valley Hospital)
Mississauga Ontario L5M2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Extension: 2765
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kaur (CPSO#: 83328 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-2200 Extn: 2765
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners (M-Site)
Department of Pathology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARKIRAN KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARKIRAN KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mothilal Nehru Medical College,Allahabad, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005