THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:17:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1986
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 110
370 Bayview drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 737-0830
Fax: (705) 737-0679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzan Abdel Salam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdel Salam (CPSO#: 83360 )
Business Address: 110 - 370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 3L7
(705) 737-0830

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 110
370 Bayview drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 3L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 737-0830
Fax: (705) 737-0679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzan Abdel Salam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdel Salam (CPSO#: 83360 )
Business Address: 110 - 370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 3L7
(705) 737-0830

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZAN YOUSEF ABDEL SALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL SALAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZAN YOUSEF ABDEL SALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL SALAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005