THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:55:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Extension: 7604
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6521 Derry Road, Suite 8
Milton Ontario L9T 7W1
Phone: (905) 876-0002
Fax: (905) 876-0003
Address: unit 402-2255 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1R6
Phone: 647 243 2780
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hani Beshara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Beshara (CPSO#: 83370 )
Business Address: 1559 Watersedge Rd
Mississauga ON L5J 1A6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Extension: 7604
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6521 Derry Road, Suite 8
Milton Ontario L9T 7W1
Phone: (905) 876-0002
Fax: (905) 876-0003
Address: unit 402-2255 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5K 1R6
Phone: 647 243 2780
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hani Beshara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Beshara (CPSO#: 83370 )
Business Address: 1559 Watersedge Rd
Mississauga ON L5J 1A6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI MOHEEB NASSEEM BESHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI MOHEEB NASSEEM BESHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESHARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005