THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:51:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-6475 Mayfield Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 19058405000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-6475 Mayfield Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4N2
Phone: 9056176666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.S. Vanvat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vanvat (CPSO#: 83372 )
Business Address: Sandalwood Medical Centre
Unit 5
2945 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J6
(905) 463-1337

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-6475 Mayfield Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 19058405000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-6475 Mayfield Rd
Brampton ON L6P 4N2
Phone: 9056176666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.S. Vanvat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vanvat (CPSO#: 83372 )
Business Address: Sandalwood Medical Centre
Unit 5
2945 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J6
(905) 463-1337

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JARNAIL SINGH VANVAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANVAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JARNAIL SINGH VANVAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANVAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005