THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:51:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cluj, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-5439
Fax: 416-229-2513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delia Curea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Curea (CPSO#: 83397 )
Business Address: Suite 311
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 222-5439

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Cluj, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 311-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-5439
Fax: 416-229-2513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delia Curea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Curea (CPSO#: 83397 )
Business Address: Suite 311
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
(416) 222-5439

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELIA CUREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUREA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELIA CUREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUREA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cluj, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Oct 2007
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2007

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005