THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:00:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Calicut University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
HGH Box 340, M-513
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44760
Fax: (905) 577-1447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Divakara Menon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Divakara Menon (CPSO#: 83399 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital McMaster Clinic
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton Street East
Suite 518
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44760

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL
Medical School: Calicut University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
HGH Box 340, M-513
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44760
Fax: (905) 577-1447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Divakara Menon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Divakara Menon (CPSO#: 83399 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital McMaster Clinic
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton Street East
Suite 518
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 44760

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jan 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 12 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syamkumar Madathattu Divakara Menon may practise medicine independently in
cardiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syamkumar Madathattu Divakara Menon may practise medicine independently in
cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Calicut University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005