THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Address: 77 Queensway West
Family Care Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B7
Phone: 9058487653
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Apr 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dror Koltin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koltin (CPSO#: 83461 )
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4120
Business Address: Suite 211
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 553-3155
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
The Division of Endocrinology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6217

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4120
Fax: (905) 813-4128
Address: 77 Queensway West
Family Care Centre
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B7
Phone: 9058487653
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 15 Apr 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 15 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dror Koltin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 May 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Koltin (CPSO#: 83461 )
Business Address: The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4120
Business Address: Suite 211
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 553-3155
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
The Division of Endocrinology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6217

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Jun 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 24 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dror Koltin may practise medicine independently in paediatrics and
paediatric endocrinology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dror Koltin may practise medicine independently in paediatrics and
paediatric endocrinology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2005