THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Rd
Suite 205
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-776-0996
Extension: 1
Fax: 5194790024
Address: Blue Water Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4534
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Cornila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cornila (CPSO#: 83494 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 168 Essex Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4R9
(519) 337-7535
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
226-776-0996 Extn: 1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Rd
Suite 205
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-776-0996
Extension: 1
Fax: 5194790024
Address: Blue Water Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4534
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Cornila Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cornila (CPSO#: 83494 )
Business Address: Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 168 Essex Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4R9
(519) 337-7535
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
226-776-0996 Extn: 1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELICA MARIOARA CORNILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNILA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGELICA MARIOARA CORNILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNILA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Aug 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2005