THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:01:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 3312
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Ct
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Anesthesia
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 111 Simcoe north
Unit 100
Oshawa Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: (416) 412-0505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1939 Kennedy Road
Suit 105
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: (416) 412-0505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6758 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1G8
Phone: 4162867675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6758 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1G8
Phone: 4162867675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 214 Colborne St. W
Whitby Ontario L1N 1X2
Phone: (905) 665-2599
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hannouche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hannouche (CPSO#: 83496 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 1939 Kennedy Road
Suite 105
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L9
Business Address: 214 Colborne Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 1X2
(905) 665-2599

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 3312
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Ct
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Anesthesia
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 111 Simcoe north
Unit 100
Oshawa Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: (416) 412-0505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1939 Kennedy Road
Suit 105
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L9
Phone: (416) 412-0505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6758 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1G8
Phone: 4162867675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6758 Kingston Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1G8
Phone: 4162867675
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 214 Colborne St. W
Whitby Ontario L1N 1X2
Phone: (905) 665-2599
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hannouche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hannouche (CPSO#: 83496 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 1939 Kennedy Road
Suite 105
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2L9
Business Address: 214 Colborne Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 1X2
(905) 665-2599

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADI HANNOUCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNOUCHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADI HANNOUCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNOUCHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2005