THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:13:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9019 Bayview Avenue
Unit 5-6
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 24 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: yat wing wong medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wong (CPSO#: 83505 )
Business Address: 9019 Yonge St
Unit 5
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0L2
9058861110

Corporation Name: Yat Wing Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9019 Bayview Avenue
Unit 5-6
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 24 May 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: yat wing wong medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wong (CPSO#: 83505 )
Business Address: 9019 Yonge St
Unit 5
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0L2
9058861110

Corporation Name: Yat Wing Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAT WING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YAT WING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University Belfast School of Medicine, Dentistry and Biomedical Sciences, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2007

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2005