THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:44:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health - RIchmond Hill
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Extension: 2071
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health
Urgent Care Centre Site
9401 Jane St.
Maple Ontario L6A 4H7
Phone: 905-883-2041
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Rauchwerger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rauchwerger (CPSO#: 83518 )
Business Address: 9401 Jane Street
Suite 101
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
905-883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health - RIchmond Hill
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Extension: 2071
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health
Urgent Care Centre Site
9401 Jane St.
Maple Ontario L6A 4H7
Phone: 905-883-2041
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David R. Rauchwerger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rauchwerger (CPSO#: 83518 )
Business Address: 9401 Jane Street
Suite 101
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2041
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
905-883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RONALD RAUCHWERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUCHWERGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID RONALD RAUCHWERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUCHWERGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2005