THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:41:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ASSYRIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15-801 Matheson Boulevard west
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 890-5600
Fax: (905) 890-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Abouna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abouna (CPSO#: 83576 )
Business Address: Matheson Centre
15 - 801 Matheson Boulevard West
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2N6
(905) 890-5600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, ASSYRIAN
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15-801 Matheson Boulevard west
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 890-5600
Fax: (905) 890-5633

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Abouna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abouna (CPSO#: 83576 )
Business Address: Matheson Centre
15 - 801 Matheson Boulevard West
Mississauga Ontario L5V 2N6
(905) 890-5600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR ABOUNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR ABOUNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Sep 2019
Summary:
Effective May 6 2021 Dr. Samir Abouna has completed all elements of his SCERP dated September 18, 2019.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Sep 2019
Summary:
Effective May 6 2021 Dr. Samir Abouna has completed all elements of his SCERP dated September 18, 2019.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2005