THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wyndham Medical office
75 Wyndham St S
Guelph Ontario N1E 5R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 265-4848
Fax: (519) 837-3974
Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Popescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Popescu (CPSO#: 83578 )
Business Address: 75 Wyndham Street South
Guelph Ontario N1E 5R3
(519) 265-4848

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wyndham Medical office
75 Wyndham St S
Guelph Ontario N1E 5R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 265-4848
Fax: (519) 837-3974
Address: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Popescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Popescu (CPSO#: 83578 )
Business Address: 75 Wyndham Street South
Guelph Ontario N1E 5R3
(519) 265-4848

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUMINITA ADRIANA POPESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPESCU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUMINITA ADRIANA POPESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPESCU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2005