THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:22:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
631 Queeston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 560-4600
Fax: (905) 560-2644

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria J. Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Pinto (CPSO#: 83588 )
Business Address: Suite 202
631 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
(905) 560-4600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
631 Queeston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 560-4600
Fax: (905) 560-2644

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria J. Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Pinto (CPSO#: 83588 )
Business Address: Suite 202
631 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 6R5
(905) 560-4600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA JOSEPHINE MARIA PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VICTORIA JOSEPHINE MARIA PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2005