THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:41:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Radiology
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Extension: 3879
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luciana Ribeiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ribeiro (CPSO#: 83652 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Radiology
P O Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 4691

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Radiology
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Extension: 3879
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luciana Ribeiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ribeiro (CPSO#: 83652 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Radiology
P O Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 4691

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIANA TORRES RIBEIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIBEIRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIANA TORRES RIBEIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIBEIRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2005