THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:23:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: Vivera, Maglin Nitha (Used Until: 05 Dec 2006)
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellis Park Medical
Units 2 & 3
1959 Bloor St W
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322
Address: Midtown health and Wellness
Suite 702
110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 2Y1
Phone: (416) 486-3300
Fax: (416) 486-9433

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maglin Bahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahal (CPSO#: 83656 )
Business Address: 602 - 110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 2Y1
(416) 486-3300
Business Address: Suite 2
1959 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4

General Information

Former Name: Vivera, Maglin Nitha (Used Until: 05 Dec 2006)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ellis Park Medical
Units 2 & 3
1959 Bloor St W
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 639-6321
Fax: (416) 639-6322
Address: Midtown health and Wellness
Suite 702
110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 2Y1
Phone: (416) 486-3300
Fax: (416) 486-9433

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jul 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 07 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maglin Bahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahal (CPSO#: 83656 )
Business Address: 602 - 110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 2Y1
(416) 486-3300
Business Address: Suite 2
1959 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1M4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGLIN NITHA BAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGLIN NITHA BAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2005
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2005